HI HB81 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-18 - Referred to EEP/EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-18 - Referred to EEP/EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of business, economic development, and tourism to allow the sale of motor vehicle gasoline that does not contain ethanol unless sufficient quantities of locally produced ethanol or biofuel crops have been produced and are available to meet the requirements under existing law.
Title
Ethanol; Gasoline; Energy Efficiency
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to EEP/EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB201 (Same As) 2013-01-31 - The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=81&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB81_.HTM |