HI HB797 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-01 - The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-01 - The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a new section to part II of chapter 205A, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to provide a process for state consistency review and certification for development by a state agency on state land within the special management area. After a notice of state consistency certification is published in the periodic bulletin by the Office of Environmental Quality Control, or upon issuance of federal consistency, a development by a state agency on state land shall be allowed within a special management area without obtaining a special management area permit or shoreline setback variance as otherwise required by chapter 205A.
Title
Coastal Zone Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-30 | House | Re-referred to WAL/OMH, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, OMH, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1027 (Same As) 2013-03-15 - The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=797&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB797_.htm |