HI HB790 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Recommitted to CPC as amended in HD 3 with none voting no and Representative(s) Har, Ichiyama excused.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes disclosure and public notification requirements for outdoor application of restricted use pesticides and insecticides in various sensitive areas. (HB790 HD3)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Environmental Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09HouseRecommitted to CPC as amended in HD 3 with none voting no and Representative(s) Har, Ichiyama excused.
2017-03-07HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 03-09-17.
2017-03-07HouseFloor amendment adopted as amended HD 3 with none voting no and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused.
2017-03-07HouseFloor Amendment No. 2 offered by Rep. Lee.
2017-03-03HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
2017-03-03HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1073) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-01HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Todd, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
2017-02-24HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2017-02-16HouseRe-referred to EEP/AGR, CPC, referral sheet 21
2017-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
2017-02-16HouseReported from EEP/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 470) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2017-02-13HouseRe-referred to EEP/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 18
2017-02-07HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-07HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-06HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2017-01-30HouseRe-referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 7
2017-01-25HouseReferred to EEP, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
2017-01-23HousePass First Reading
2017-01-21HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback