HI HB787 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB787
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the department of human services to restore adult dental benefits to medicaid enrollees. Requires federal matching funds.
Title
Making An Appropriation To Restore Adult Dental Benefits To Medicaid Enrollees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB467 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB787 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB787 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=787&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB787_.HTM |