HI HB786 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB786
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to submit a report on improving and expediting mental health evaluations of specific defendants. (HB786 HD1)
Title
Relating To Mental Health Examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 78). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 525) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:30AM in conference room 430. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB786 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, JDC.