HI HB781 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants ten-year license for one stand-alone casino in Waikiki not in a hotel. Establishes Hawaii Gaming Control Commission. Imposes fifteen percent wagering tax on gross receipts. Creates State Gaming Fund and Compulsive Gambler Program. Effective January 7, 2059. (HB781 HD1)
Title
Stand-Alone Casino Gaming; Waikiki
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Recommitted to JUD with Representative(s) Ward voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 585) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Rhoads, Cabanilla; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Morita. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-17-11 3:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |