HI HB773 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to AEN, JDL.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes modifications to the Industrial Hemp Pilot Program by permitting submission of a license application at any time during the year in which the applicant plans to grow industrial hemp, amending physical facility requirements, and repealing the requirement for a movement permit to transport plants or plant material. (HB773 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Industrial Hemp.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09SenateReferred to AEN, JDL.
2017-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 293).
2017-03-07HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
2017-03-03HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1042) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-01HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, McDermott.
2017-02-28HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-01-17 12:00PM in conference room 325.
2017-02-28HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-01-17.
2017-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
2017-02-16HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 437) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2017-02-08HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-08-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2017-01-25HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 3
2017-01-23HousePass First Reading
2017-01-20HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback