HI HB769 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB769
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the tax rate on sales of large cigars.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-17 2:05PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-17 at 2:05PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB769 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=769&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB769_.HTM |