HI HB758 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB758
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of land and natural resources to issue special activity permits for the purpose of recognizing and protecting individuals exercising their Native Hawaiian traditional and customary rights. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Native Hawaiian Traditional And Customary Fishing Practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-02 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1036 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB758 (Carry Over) 2023-03-02 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB758 (Carry Over) 2023-03-02 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Aquatic Resources
DLNR
Native Hawaiian Traditional and Customary Fishing Practices
Protection
Recognition
DLNR
Native Hawaiian Traditional and Customary Fishing Practices
Protection
Recognition
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=758&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB758_HD1_.HTM |