HI HB739 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB739
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires manufacturers of connected devices to equip the devices with reasonable security features regarding information collected, unauthorized access, or the destruction or use of the devices.
Title
Relating To Information Privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HET, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1002 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB739 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB739 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=739&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB739_.HTM |