HI HB735 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB735
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to establish and enforce rules for the regulation of opioid treatment programs.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB735 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=735&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB735_.HTM |