HI HB731 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a five-year evidence-based physical-activity and nutritional-education pilot program within the A+ Program in Hawaii's public elementary schools. Makes appropriations.
Title
Afterschool Programs; Elementary-School Students; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB858 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EDU/HMS, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=731&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB731_.HTM |