HI HB727 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the minimum wage annually starting January 1, 2020. Beginning September 30, 2024, and thereafter, requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate to the nearest five cents using the Honolulu Region Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers, subject to certain conditions. Repeals the tip credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Minimum Wage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB476 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback