HI HB726 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB726
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every person to wear a face covering when in a public setting, subject to certain exceptions. Establishes a civil fine for failure to wear a face covering. Sunsets December 31, 2021, or when the last emergency proclamation related to the COVID-19 emergency issued by the governor expires, whichever is sooner. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Face Coverings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 518) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) DeCoite, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 92) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:45AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB726 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).