HI HB726 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB726

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires every person to wear a face covering when in a public setting, subject to certain exceptions. Establishes a civil fine for failure to wear a face covering. Sunsets December 31, 2021, or when the last emergency proclamation related to the COVID-19 emergency issued by the governor expires, whichever is sooner. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Face Coverings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 518) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and Excused: none.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) DeCoite, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2021-02-09HouseReported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 92) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-02HouseThe committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:45AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB726 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback