HI HB709 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Re-referred to LAB/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Re-referred to LAB/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that of the two persons on the Board of Detectives and Guards who are actively engaged in any of the licensed practices, one shall be a public employee.
Title
Private Detectives and Guards; Board Composition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Re-referred to LAB/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 15 |
2015-02-10 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-11-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB989 (Same As) 2015-02-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=709&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB709_.HTM |