HI HB690 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB690
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Decreases income tax rates by approximately 25 percent for all but the top income earners. Reinstates higher income tax brackets and rates similar to those that were repealed on 12/31/2015. (HB690 HD1)
Title
Relating To Income Tax Rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 289). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 823) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka, Tupola; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB690 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to WAM.