HI HB686 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB686
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Public Safety to inspect shipping containers for illegal fireworks and explosives. Establishes a shipping container inspection program using X-ray scanning portals and associated special fund. Authorizes Department of Transportation to impose shipping container import fees. Increases fine and punishment for fireworks violations.
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB686 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=686&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB686_.HTM |