HI HB672 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB672

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends certain parts of the conflicts of interests law in the state ethics code to include members of the legislature. Clarifies that the conflicts of interests law does not prohibit legislators from introducing legislation, serving on a committee, making statements, or taking action in the exercise of their legislative functions. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The State Ethics Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 601) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson, Ward.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21 at 10:30 am.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB672 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback