HI HB672 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB672
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends certain parts of the conflicts of interests law in the state ethics code to include members of the legislature. Clarifies that the conflicts of interests law does not prohibit legislators from introducing legislation, serving on a committee, making statements, or taking action in the exercise of their legislative functions. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Ethics Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 601) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson, Ward. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21 at 10:30 am. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB672 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).