HI HB66 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB66
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of land and natural resources to sell parcels of Sand Island Industrial Park to a lessee under a master lease.
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-03 | House | Re-referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL/ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB176 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB66 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB66 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=66&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB66_.HTM |