HI SB176 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB176

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that each industrial park lease shall include a rent escalation clause that specifies that increases in rental rates for a 5-year period shall not exceed the lower of the percentage specified in the Consumer Price Index or 10%. Authorizes the Board of Land and Natural Resources to sell parcels of Sand Island Industrial Park to a lessee under a master lease. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to WAL, CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 162) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 18; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Taniguchi, Wakai. Noes, 7 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 763) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-03-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Kanuha, Taniguchi, Wakai ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-04-21 1:30PM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-03-04SenateRe-Referred to WAM.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB66 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB176 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to WAL, CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback