HI HB66 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 193, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 193, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the existing Uniform Athlete Agents Act and replaces it with the Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act, which applies to certain financial advisers and makes other changes to the Uniform Act to increase effectiveness and enforceability. (HB66 CD1)
Title
Relating To Athlete Agents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 193, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 193, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 91). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 91) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Todd, Gates, D. Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Ohno added as Co-Chair. Representative D. Kobayashi discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Member. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: D. Kobayashi, Takumi, Todd Co-Chairs; Gates, McDermott. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 695) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1905) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1418) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 10). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 900), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 638), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 240) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-29 | House | Re-referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |