HI HB656 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
During the economic downturn, allows liquor licensees who have an agreement to repay delinquent liquor taxes on a payment plan schedule and who are current and not in default, to renew their liquor licenses. (HB656 HD1)
Title
Liquor License Renewal; Delinquent Tax Payment Plan
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Rep. Roland Sagum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Wakai excused (2). | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2009-01-29 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Takai, Wakai. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 01-29-09 8:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to EBM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |