HI HB646 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB646
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a per person, per day admission tax on certain live adult entertainment businesses. Imposes filing, reporting, and recordkeeping requirements. Deposits moneys collected from the tax into the human trafficking victim services fund.
Title
Relating To Live Adult Entertainment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB646 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=646&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB646_.HTM |