HI HB644 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB644
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a landlord or landlord's agent to charge an application screening fee for certain applicants at the time a rental application is processed for residential property. Requires the landlord or landlord's agent to provide a receipt for payment of the application screening fee and a breakdown of the application screening fee. Requires the landlord or landlord's agent to return any unauthorized fee amounts to the applicant. Requires, on 5/1/2024, the office of consumer protection to produce and make available informational materials and publicize requirements regarding application fees and related rights and obligations. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Residential Landlord-tenant Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 437) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-10-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB930 (Same As)
HB644 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0).
HB644 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Application Screening Fee
Credit Report
Informational Materials
OCP
Residential Landlord-Tenant Code
Tenant Report
Credit Report
Informational Materials
OCP
Residential Landlord-Tenant Code
Tenant Report
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=644&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB644_HD1_.HTM |