HI HB63 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB63
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a high school education or its equivalent as a condition for obtaining a license as a real estate broker or real estate salesperson. (HB63 HD1)
Title
Relating To Real Estate Licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 408) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:15AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB63 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
SB770 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 246, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).
SB770 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 246, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).