HI HB618 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB618
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to ensure that the department's annual budget request to the legislature includes adequate funding for Hawaiian education. Requires the university of Hawaii board of regents to make support of Hawaiian education partnerships a benchmark when developing the university's annual budget request.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN/HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB618 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDN/HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=618&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB618_.HTM |