HI HB595 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB595
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission to further address and make recommendations regarding sea level rise. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Sea Level Rise.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB475 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB595 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB595 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Coordinator
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission
Sea Level Rise
Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Coordinator
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission
Sea Level Rise
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=595&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB595_.HTM |