HI HB583 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an annual inflationary adjustment to long-term care facility prospective reimbursement rates for care provided to Medicaid recipients. (HB583 HD1)
Title
Long-Term Care Facility; Inflationary Update
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 983) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 66). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 732), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 501) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2015-02-19 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro. |
2015-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 02-19-15 11:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |