HI HB576 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB576
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the management and operation of the east Hawaii regional system of the HHSC to the county of Hawaii.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-08 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB576 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=576&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB576_.HTM |