HI HB571 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB571
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the felony offense of importation, sale, or possession of a childlike sex doll. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Childlike Sex Dolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 234). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 879) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB571 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.
SB834 (Same As) 2021-06-25 - Act 067, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
SB834 (Same As) 2021-06-25 - Act 067, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).