HI SB834 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 067, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 067, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of importation, sale, or possession of one or more childlike sex dolls. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Childlike Sex Dolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Act 067, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169). |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Act 067, 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 27) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 27). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 4:05PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 4:00PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kitagawa, Ichiyama Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Acasio, Fevella. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 534). |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1838) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-30-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1513) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 19 |
2021-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 62) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-24-21. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 594) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB571 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.