HI HB564 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB564
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the categories of women required to be covered for mammogram screenings. Requires the existing health insurance mandate for coverage of low-dose mammography to include digital mammography and breast tomosynthesis. Defines digital breast tomosynthesis. Requires health care providers to be reimbursed at rates accurately reflecting the resource costs specific to each service, including any increased resource cost after January 1, 2021.
Title
Relating To Breast Cancer Screening.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB827 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB564 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB564 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=564&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB564_.HTM |