HI HB564 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the categories of women required to be covered for mammogram screenings. Requires the existing health insurance mandate for coverage of low-dose mammography to include digital mammography and breast tomosynthesis. Defines digital breast tomosynthesis. Requires health care providers to be reimbursed at rates accurately reflecting the resource costs specific to each service, including any increased resource cost after January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Breast Cancer Screening.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB827 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback