HI HB562 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB562
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an exemption from applicable county permit requirements for repetitive construction projects for facilities under the control of the Department of Education, University of Hawaii, or School Facilities Authority. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-22 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-23 3:16PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/EDU/HRE, WAM. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EDU/HRE, JDC. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 306). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1207), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 209) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-01-31 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB562 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
SB1096 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1096 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
County Permit Exemptions
Department of Education
Repetitive Construction
School Facilities Authority
University of Hawaii
Department of Education
Repetitive Construction
School Facilities Authority
University of Hawaii
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=562&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB562_HD1_.HTM |