HI HB558 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Act 079, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Act 079, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals Section 325-15, Hawaii Revised Statutes, which requires United States citizens or nationals to submit a medical examination report to the Department of Health within sixty days of returning to the State under certain conditions. (HB558 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Repeal Of Section 325-15, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Act 079, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180). |
2017-07-06 | House | Act 079, on 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Ito, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (5) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 37). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 37) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Ihara, Nishihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 586) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee on CPH will reconsider its previous decision on 03-15-17 and will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 273). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1003) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-08 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB147 (Same As) 2017-03-07 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 26