HI HB556 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the state building code council include voting members with experience and knowledge in building energy efficiency standards and sustainable building, design, construction, and operation. Requires that the counties amend or adopt their respective building codes and standards based upon the International Energy Conservation Code within an unspecified time frame after the adoption of the Hawaii state building energy conservation code. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Energy Efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB556 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).