HI HB556 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to GVO/HMS, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to GVO/HMS, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that all applicants for health and human services procurement contracts possess all licenses necessary to conduct the subject business. Repeals the requirement that all contracts include only costs, fees, and taxes reflected on the face of the proposal. (HB556 HD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HMS, CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 112). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 952), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 269) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB556 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to GVO/HMS, CPH/WAM.
SB148 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
SB148 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.