HI HB546 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the composition of the early learning board to make a representative from Aha Punana Leo a standing member. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka.
2021-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 460) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-11-21 3:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback