HI HB533 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires food establishments to post notices warning that certain foods in the food establishment may contain peanuts or be prepared with products derived from peanuts. Makes notices subject to inspection of food establishments by department of health staff. Establishes penalty. Requires director of health to adopt rules.
Title
Peanut Allergy; Mandatory Signs in Food Establishments
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-03-09 8:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=533&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB533_.HTM |