HI HB524 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a $500 civil fine for the feeding or attempted feeding of any feral chicken. Provides that the Department of Health shall enforce this prohibition regardless of whether the department determines there is a nuisance that is dangerous or injurious to health. Authorizes county police departments to issue citations.
Title
Relating To Animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB524 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=524&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB524_.HTM |