HI HB520 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-16-17 2:04PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts from the Hawaii Public Procurement Code contracts by governmental bodies to procure goods or services for the Office of Intercollegiate Athletics of the University of Hawaii at Manoa with moneys from the University of Hawaii at Manoa Intercollegiate Athletics Special Fund. (HB520 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To University Of Hawaii Athletics.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-16-17 2:04PM in conference room 309.
2017-02-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-16-17 2:04PM in House conference room 309.
2017-02-02HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1).
2017-02-02HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
2017-01-31HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-01-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-31-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2017-01-25HouseReferred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 3
2017-01-23HousePass First Reading
2017-01-20HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback