HI HB520 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB520
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from the Hawaii Public Procurement Code contracts by governmental bodies to procure goods or services for the Office of Intercollegiate Athletics of the University of Hawaii at Manoa with moneys from the University of Hawaii at Manoa Intercollegiate Athletics Special Fund. (HB520 HD1)
Title
Relating To University Of Hawaii Athletics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-16-17 2:04PM in conference room 309. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-16-17 2:04PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-31-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB520 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-16-17 2:04PM in conference room 309.