HI HB506 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the State from paying or reimbursing contractors for the General Excise Tax. Effective 07/01/2030. (HD1)
Title
General Excise Tax; State; Contractors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 147). |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 602) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |