HI HB500 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 119, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 119, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the operating and capital improvement budget of the Executive Branch for fiscal years 20152016 and 20162017. (HB500 CD1)
Title
State Budget ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Act 119, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2015-06-16 | House | Act 119, on 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 698). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 101). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 101) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman. |
2015-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nishimoto, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-21-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 637). |
2015-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nishimoto, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 615). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2015-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1360) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-15 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 339). |
2015-03-18 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Pouha, Tupola excused (3). |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 911) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-11 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-11-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-24 | House | Received from Governor re: Additional Proposed Changes (Gov. Msg. No. 209). |
2015-02-12 | House | Received from Governor re: Proposed Changes (Gov. Msg. No. 207). |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |