HI HB489 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of failure to yield right-of-way to mass transit vehicles.
Title
Mass Transit Vehicle Right of Way; Violation; Penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 424), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-09-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |