HI HB484 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Agriculture to collaborate with agricultural growers and researchers to develop and implement a program to safely distribute disease- and insect-free tropical plant materials to Hawaii farmers. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agricultural Production.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB479 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback