HI HB482 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:10pm in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:10pm in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Whitmore project facility revenue bond special fund into which proceeds from revenue bonds shall be deposited for purchasing certain parcels of land from Dole Food Company, Inc. Appropriates funds to acquire certain Dole Food lands. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Whitmore Project Facility Revenue Bond Special Fund; Dole Food Company; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:10pm in Conference Room 224. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 3:01PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-22-14 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Wooley, Evans, Luke Co-Chairs; Matsumoto Member. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Nishihara, Kidani Co-Chairs; Kouchi, Wakai Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 506) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from EGH/AGL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi, Ruderman. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, English. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, English. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/AGL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-14 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to EGH/AGL/WAM. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AGL/JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cheape, Cullen, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, Oshiro, Takayama, Ward, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, Ito, McDermott, Say, Tokioka, Tsuji voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 893), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 535) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Fale; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka, Cheape; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, Takayama. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Monday, 02-04-13 8:30AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |