HI HB476 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the prohibition on the sale of Kakaako community development district lands to Kakaako makai lands and requires specified findings for allowable sales. Requires HCDA to perform a cost-benefit analysis of certain allowable real property sales in Kakaako. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB476 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Kakaako
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2). |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-04-13 10:50AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |